This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 11:13:58 (UTC).

GOLDEN HAMMER RESTORATIONS INC VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 GOLDEN HAMMER RESTORATIONS INC filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDEN HAMMER RESTORATIONS INC

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSKEY, STEVEN MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

LITTLE, BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION: AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

06/15/2020:OBJECTION: AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

MOTION: FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

06/15/2020:MOTION: FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

RETURNED MAIL

05/29/2020:RETURNED MAIL

ORDER DENYING: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

05/05/2020:ORDER DENYING: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

ORDER SETTING HEARING 5/5/2020 11AM

04/28/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING 5/5/2020 11AM

NOTICE OF FILING: IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGUARDING DEFENDANTS OBLIGATION TO PAY INCURRED EXPENSES

04/22/2020:NOTICE OF FILING: IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGUARDING DEFENDANTS OBLIGATION TO PAY INCURRED EXPENSES

RESPONSE: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

04/09/2020:RESPONSE: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

MOTION: TO COMPEL

04/09/2020:MOTION: TO COMPEL

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

04/08/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION:

03/26/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION:

NOTICE:

03/26/2020:NOTICE:

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

03/26/2020:NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/26/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING:

03/26/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING:

INTERROGATORIES

03/06/2020:INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE: PLAINTIFF

03/06/2020:RESPONSE: PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/06/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/27/2020:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOBJECTION: AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION: FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURNED MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2020

HearingEvent Date: 05/05/2020 11:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: HEAR; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX CHAMBE; Defendant Attorney: Little, Bradley

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER DENYING: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING HEARING 5/5/2020 11AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING: IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGUARDING DEFENDANTS OBLIGATION TO PAY INCURRED EXPENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION: TO COMPEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
11/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketINTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 154953

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000451CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/14/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less