This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/21/2019 at 18:40:36 (UTC).

GDSA Lands, LLC VS HILDENBRAND, ERIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 GDSA Lands, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HILDENBRAND, ERIN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GDSA Lands, LLC

Defendants

HILDENBRAND, ERIN

MCCLELLAN, CHRISTOPHER

HILDENBRAND, FREDERICK

MCCLELLAN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

07/17/2017:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MISCELLANEOUS: AUTHORIZATION OF CORP OFFICER

07/17/2017:MISCELLANEOUS: AUTHORIZATION OF CORP OFFICER

EVICTION COMPLAINT

07/17/2017:EVICTION COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

07/17/2017:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: S MCCLELLAN

07/17/2017:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: S MCCLELLAN

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: C MCCLELLAN

07/17/2017:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: C MCCLELLAN

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: F HILDENBRAND

07/17/2017:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: F HILDENBRAND

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: E HILDENBRAND

07/17/2017:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: E HILDENBRAND

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: C MCCLELLAN 18JULY2017

07/20/2017:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: C MCCLELLAN 18JULY2017

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: E HILDENBRAND 18JULY2017

07/20/2017:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: E HILDENBRAND 18JULY2017

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: F HILDENBRAND 18JULY2017

07/20/2017:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: F HILDENBRAND 18JULY2017

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: S MCCLELLAN 18JULY2017

07/20/2017:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: S MCCLELLAN 18JULY2017

NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL

02/14/2019:NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: FREDERICK HILDENBRAND

02/22/2019:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: FREDERICK HILDENBRAND

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: CHRISTOPHER MCCLELLAN

02/25/2019:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: CHRISTOPHER MCCLELLAN

RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: STEPHANIE MCCLELLAN

02/25/2019:RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: STEPHANIE MCCLELLAN

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: STEPHANIE MCCLELLAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: CHRISTOPHER MCCLELLAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE: FREDERICK HILDENBRAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: S MCCLELLAN 18JULY2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: F HILDENBRAND 18JULY2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: E HILDENBRAND 18JULY2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: C MCCLELLAN 18JULY2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: E HILDENBRAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: F HILDENBRAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: C MCCLELLAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: S MCCLELLAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketMISCELLANEOUS: AUTHORIZATION OF CORP OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017

DocketPayment received: $225.00 Receipt Number YX 108567

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2017

DocketCase 452017CC000235CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/17/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less