This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/12/2022 at 14:33:07 (UTC).

FREDENBURG, KEVIN VS KB HOME Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 FREDENBURG, KEVIN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE and ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREDENBURG, KEVIN

Defendants

KB HOME

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'BRIEN, NEIL PATRICK

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/13/2022:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/13/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

10/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

10/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME

10/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 11/02/22

11/04/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 11/02/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME FLORIDA C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS REG. AGENT 11/03/22

11/07/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME FLORIDA C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS REG. AGENT 11/03/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS REG. AGENT 11/03/22

11/07/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS REG. AGENT 11/03/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS REG. AGENT 11/03/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME FLORIDA C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, AS REG. AGENT 11/03/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: KB HOME C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 11/02/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number YX 204034

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000334CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less