This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 04/16/2022 at 16:38:34 (UTC).

FOREHAND, GARY VS FOREHAND, MARIAH

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 FOREHAND, GARY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FOREHAND, MARIAH. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT FOSTER and BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT FOSTER

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FOREHAND, GARY

Respondent

FOREHAND, MARIAH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/12/2022

DocketEvent PROSE scheduled on 4/19/2022 at 0145 PM, YX - Judge ROBERT FOSTER presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING 04/19/22 01:55 PM VIA ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketRESPONDENT/WIFE'S ANSWER AND WAIVER TO HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketHUSBAND'S PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: GARY FOREHAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 194005

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketCase 452022DR000235DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/17/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less