This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 11:19:58 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS VALVO, FRANCES

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed an Other lawsuit against VALVO, FRANCES. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

VALVO, FRANCES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INGINO, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT

03/20/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE:

03/20/2020:CORRESPONDENCE:

AFFIDAVIT: INDEBTEDNESS

03/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT: INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT: BUSINESS RECORDS

03/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT: BUSINESS RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES

03/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT: INTEREST

03/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT: INTEREST

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

03/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES

03/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

03/13/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

CLERKS DEFAULT: FRANCES VALVO

02/06/2020:CLERKS DEFAULT: FRANCES VALVO

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/06/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

02/06/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SERGIO MILLER (BROTHER) 01/03/2020

01/07/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SERGIO MILLER (BROTHER) 01/03/2020

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/27/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/14/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: FRANCES VALVO

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: FRANCES VALVO

COMPLAINT

11/01/2019:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: BUSINESS RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SERGIO MILLER (BROTHER) 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: FRANCES VALVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 154247

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCase 452019CC000424CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ingino, Michael James