This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:04:43 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS HICKMAN, RAYMOND

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed an Other lawsuit against HICKMAN, RAYMOND. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

HICKMAN, RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLOMON, MARVIN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/20/2019:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/20/2019:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RAYMOND HICKMAN

11/20/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RAYMOND HICKMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED: RAYMOND HICKMAN

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: RAYMOND HICKMAN

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RAYMOND HICKMAN 12/05/2019

12/06/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RAYMOND HICKMAN 12/05/2019

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

01/14/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT: OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

01/14/2020:AFFIDAVIT: OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/14/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT: RAYMOND HICKMAN

01/22/2020:DEFAULT: RAYMOND HICKMAN

AFFIDAVIT: IN PROOF OF CLAIM

01/29/2020:AFFIDAVIT: IN PROOF OF CLAIM

FINAL JUDGMENT

01/30/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: MARVIN SOLOMON ESQ

01/30/2020:CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: MARVIN SOLOMON ESQ

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/03/2020:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

02/10/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: MARVIN SOLOMON ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: IN PROOF OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT: RAYMOND HICKMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: RAYMOND HICKMAN 12/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: RAYMOND HICKMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RAYMOND HICKMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 155256

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase 452019CC000454CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARVIN SOLOMON