This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 21:22:33 (UTC).

FLYNN, MICHAEL STEPHEN VS FLYNN, KAILA GRACE

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 FLYNN, MICHAEL STEPHEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FLYNN, KAILA GRACE. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLYNN, MICHAEL STEPHEN

Respondent

FLYNN, KAILA GRACE

Not Classified By Court

GIUFFREDA, KAILA GRACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NEAVE, ANGELA RENEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - MICHAEL STEPHEN FLYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - WIFES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: WIFES FINANICAL AFFIDAVIT - WIFES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE: WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE - WIFES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: VIA ZOOM 07/14/20 @ 9:30 AM - FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT/ DEFUALT MICHAEL STEPHEN FLYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number YX 163906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCase 452020DR000341DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 4/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEAVE , ANGELA RENEE