This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:46:40 (UTC).

FIDA, JOSEPH R., FIDA, JOSEPH RICHARD Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 FIDA, JOSEPH R , FIDA, JOSEPH RICHARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FINA, MARY JO

BOYLE, LOUIS

Decedent

FIDA, JOSEPH R.

Not Classified By Court

FIDA, JOSEPH RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DRAKE, KRISTEN DABBS

PRESUTTI, JOSEPH HENRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/10/2022

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketWAIVER COLLEEN FIDA-FOSTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketWAIVER KERRY ROSS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketWAIVER MARYANN DICESARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketWAIVER LOUIS DICESARI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketWAIVER MARY FINA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketWAIVER MARY FINA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
09/14/2021

DocketRECEIPT OF WILL **COPY OF WILL ATTACHED**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2021

DocketCORRESPONDENCE: TO CLERK 8/24/21 KRISTEN DRAKE P.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 185645

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketCase 452021CP000368CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less