This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County on 10/01/2021 at 14:32:45 (UTC).

EPPERLY, HALEY VS Q AND L TRUCKING INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 EPPERLY, HALEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Q AND L TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL and FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EPPERLY, HALEY

Defendants

ROGERS, LEROY

Q AND L TRUCKING INC

SEACOAST TRANSPORTATION & LOGI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTIGLIATTI, STEFANO DI

Defendant Attorney

EGAN, SEAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

09/29/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

09/29/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

09/29/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

09/28/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

09/22/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/22/2021:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/12/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: SEACOAST TRANSPORTATION AND LOGISTICS INC

09/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: SEACOAST TRANSPORTATION AND LOGISTICS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED: LEROY ROGERS

09/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: LEROY ROGERS

SUMMONS ISSUED: Q AND L TRUCKING INC

09/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: Q AND L TRUCKING INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/02/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/02/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

09/02/2021:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

09/02/2021:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/01/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/01/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/01/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

09/01/2021:COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SEACOAST TRANSPORTATION AND LOGISTICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: LEROY ROGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: Q AND L TRUCKING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number YX 185670

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase 452021CA000261CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Sean Michael