This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:20:21 (UTC).

EMERSON, JACKIE L VS EMERSON, GARY L

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 EMERSON, JACKIE L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EMERSON, GARY L. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EMERSON, JACKIE L

Respondent

EMERSON, GARY L

Not Classified By Court

EMERSON, GARY

WOOD, JACKIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FALTEMIER, VALERIE

Respondent Attorney

BRUNET, JAMES PRESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketMOTION: FOR ORDER IN RE DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: EDDIE FORRESTER JR 3/16/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 03/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE: TO FORMER WIFE'S VERIFIED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF MONETARY JUDGMENT AGAINST FORMER HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED TO INCLUDE ZOOM LINK): 03/24/22 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA: EDDIE FORRESTER, JR. 03/24/22 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA: JIM VANNATTER 03/24/22 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCONSENT ORDER: IN REGARD TO PROCEEDS FROM SALE OF PARTIES' REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketReopened for REOPEN OTHER on 2/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GARY EMERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number YX 185328

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000803DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brunet, James Preston