This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:18:09 (UTC).

EMBREY, KEVIN W, EMBREY, NANCY LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 EMBREY, KEVIN W, EMBREY, NANCY LEE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EMBREY, KEVIN W

Decedent

EMBREY, NANCY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POOLE, WESLEY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $21.00 Receipt Number YX 188133

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $21.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $3.00 Receipt Number YX 186609

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCompliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 9/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF WILL **COPY OF ORIGINAL WILL ATTACHED**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 185482

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase 452021CP000364CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POOLE, WESLEY R