This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 10/03/2019 at 17:34:20 (UTC).

DOVER, DEBORAH S, SMITH, MILBY V Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 DOVER, DEBORAH S, SMITH, MILBY filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

DOVER, DEBORAH S

SMITH, MILBY VERNON SR

Decedent

SMITH, MILBY V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KNEE, KATHRYN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/01/2019

DocketPayment received: $6.00 Receipt Number YX 152205

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019

DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2019

DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2019

DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number YX 150928

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketWAIVER DAVID SMITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketWAIVER MILBY SMITH JR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2019

DocketCase 452019CP000337CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/9/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less