This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 23:56:17 (UTC).

DOENGES, MISTY VS DOENGES, RANDY

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 DOENGES, MISTY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DOENGES, RANDY. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOENGES, MISTY

Respondent

DOENGES, RANDY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/31/2020

DocketANSWER: TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - HUSBANDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2020

DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE MISTY DOENGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE - MISTY DOENGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketNOTICE OF: LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: MISTY DOENGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER: WIFES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE -WIFES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketCase 452020DR000562DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less