This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/07/2022 at 15:36:25 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS SAMANTHA L NELSEN

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAMANTHA L NELSEN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SAMANTHA L NELSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT HAROLD

 

Court Documents

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/08/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COVER SHEET

08/08/2022:COVER SHEET

ORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

08/08/2022:ORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/08/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/08/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: SAMANTHA NELSEN

08/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: SAMANTHA NELSEN

 

Docket Entries

09/20/2022

HearingEvent Date: 09/20/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SAMANTHA NELSEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 9/20/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 200858

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000430SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/8/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less