This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 04/07/2022 at 15:36:19 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MCKINNEY, PHILLIP E

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCKINNEY, PHILLIP E. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MCKINNEY, PHILLIP E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT HAROLD

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/08/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/08/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/08/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/08/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

03/08/2022:ORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

SUMMONS ISSUED: PHILLIP MCKINNEY 4/26/22 @ 9AM

03/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: PHILLIP MCKINNEY 4/26/22 @ 9AM

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2022

HearingEvent Date: 04/26/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 4/26/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: PHILLIP MCKINNEY 4/26/22 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 193566

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000149SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/8/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less