This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/22/2019 15:30:32

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by DISCOUNT PAYDAY LOANS against ROBERTS, SHANNEN in the jurisdiction of Nassau County Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXYX
  • Filing Date 05/29/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Nassau County Courts
  • Judge POOLE, WESLEY R
  • Courthouse Nassau County Historic Courthouse
  • County Nassau
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff DISCOUNT PAYDAY LOANS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ROBERTS, SHANNEN
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED: S ROBERTS

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: S ROBERTS

Free with Subscription
STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/29/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

Free with Subscription
SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/29/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SHANNEN ROBERTS

06/13/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SHANNEN ROBERTS

Free with Subscription
PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/29/2019:PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM

Free with Subscription
NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

05/29/2019:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Event SCM scheduled on 7/30/2019 at 0930 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.
  • 06/13/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SHANNEN ROBERTS
  • 05/29/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: S ROBERTS
  • 05/29/2019
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY
  • 05/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS
  • 05/29/2019
  • PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM
  • 05/29/2019
  • SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received: $90.00 Receipt Number YX 144502
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00
  • 05/29/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 452019SC000262SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019
  • 07/30/2019
  • Event Date: 07/30/2019 09:30; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: SCM; Location: YX HISTORIC COURTROOM; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.