This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:12:09 (UTC).

DICKINSON, AYNSLEY, DICKINSON, RONALD DALE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 DICKINSON, AYNSLEY, DICKINSON, RONALD DALE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DICKINSON, AYNSLEY

Decedent

DICKINSON, RONALD DALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HOLMGREN, STEPHEN PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/20/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM SUNSCRIPT JACKSONVILLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

DocketINVENTORY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number YX 182770

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2021

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM MAYO CLINIC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketCompliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 6/8/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketWAIVER KRISTI DICKINSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 180998

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketCase 452021CP000230CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/27/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less