This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:22:06 (UTC).

DEGGES, KATELYN MARIE VS DEGGES, NATHANIEL R

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 DEGGES, KATELYN MARIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEGGES, NATHANIEL R. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BASS, LESTER B and BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BASS, LESTER B

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEGGES, KATELYN MARIE

Respondent

DEGGES, NATHANIEL R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CLARK, JOHN JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

COLSON, REBECCA JETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAMENDED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: KATELYN DEGGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES WIFE'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE: WIFE'S TO HUSBAND'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketWIFE'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ANWERS TO WIFE'S AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE: RESPONDENT'S TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERING STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL OR ENFORCEMENT PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketWIFE'S AMENED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCONSENT ORDER: GRANTING WIFE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketUCCJ AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number YX 184944

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: BASS , LESTER B Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000781DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLSON, REBECCA JETT