This case was last updated from Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/06/2022 at 14:34:43 (UTC).

CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION VS FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING,

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING,. This case was filed in Nassau County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE and ROBERSON, ERIC C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

ROBERSON, ERIC C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

Defendant

FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/06/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/06/2022:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/06/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING LLC

06/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BILL BERGE, REG, AGENT, FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING, LLC

06/27/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BILL BERGE, REG, AGENT, FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BILL BERGE, REG, AGENT, FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: FLOW AND CONTROL ENGINEERING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number YX 197696

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase 452022CA000174CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less