This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/28/2020 at 15:36:44 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS NAPIER, WARREN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NAPIER, WARREN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

NAPIER, WARREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/30/2020:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/30/2020:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/30/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/30/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/30/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: ZOOM 1/26/21 WARREN NAPIER

11/05/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: ZOOM 1/26/21 WARREN NAPIER

 

Docket Entries

01/26/2021

HearingEvent Date: 01/26/2021 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX Grand; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 1/26/2021 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ZOOM 1/26/21 WARREN NAPIER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 171650

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020

DocketCase 452020SC000878SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/30/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less