This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/06/2019 at 15:31:12 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. VS NEAVES, JONATHON

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEAVES, JONATHON. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC.

Defendant

NEAVES, JONATHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/12/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COVER SHEET

06/12/2019:COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/12/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/12/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: JONATHON NEAVES

06/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: JONATHON NEAVES

 

Docket Entries

06/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JONATHON NEAVES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 7/30/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 145445

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000287SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/12/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2019

DocketEvent Date: 07/30/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: YX HISTORIC COURTROOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less