This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/04/2022 at 13:44:44 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS RAYSOR, DEENA

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against RAYSOR, DEENA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

RAYSOR, DEENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OROVITZ, ROBERT JAY

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/06/2022:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/06/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/06/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COMPLAINT

07/06/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: DEENA RAYSOR

07/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: DEENA RAYSOR

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/20/2022:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

07/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: DEENA RAYSOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 199482

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

DocketCase 452022CC000236CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less