****************AXYX
02/11/2022
Disposed - Other Disposed
Family - Other Family
Nassau, Florida
BASS, LESTER B
LESTER BASS
BASS, LESTER BERNARD
CRADY, STEVEN
WALKER, JAMIE
Court documents are not available for this case.
DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAMIE BARKER
[-] Read LessDocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEVEN CRADY 2/24/22
[-] Read LessDocketCase Status set to CLOSED
[-] Read LessDocketDV CLOSING ORDER DENYING PET INJ
[-] Read LessDocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEVEN CRADY 02/22/2022 2:14 PM
[-] Read LessDocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAMIE BARKER-WALKER 2/18/2022 8:05AM
[-] Read LessDocketPROPOSED EXHIBIT:STEVEN CRADY
[-] Read LessDocketDV ORDER SETTING HEARING: 02/24/2022 8:30AM
[-] Read LessDocketDV ORDER SET HRNG TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
[-] Read LessDocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF INJUNCTION PROCEDURES AND COURT DATE & TIME
[-] Read LessDocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION
[-] Read LessDocketCHECKLIST
[-] Read LessDocketINFORMATION SHEET
[-] Read LessDocketCOVER SHEET
[-] Read LessDocketEvent DV scheduled on 2/24/2022 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge LESTER BASS presiding.
[-] Read LessDocketCase 452022DR000120DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/11/2022
[-] Read LessDocketJudge: BASS , LESTER B assigned
[-] Read Less