This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/12/2022 at 16:53:29 (UTC).

CRADY, STEVEN VS MCBETH, CHRIS

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 CRADY, STEVEN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MCBETH, CHRIS. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LESTER BASS, BASS, LESTER B and BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LESTER BASS

BASS, LESTER B

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRADY, STEVEN

Respondent

MCBETH, CHRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CHRIS MCBETH 2/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEVEN CRADY 2/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDV CLOSING ORDER DENYING PET INJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED:STEVEN CRADY 2:15PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CHRIS MCBETH 2/18/2022 8:32 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED EXHIBIT: STEVEN CRADY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDV ORDER SETTING HEARING:02/24/2022 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDV ORDER SET HRNG TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF INJUNCTION PROCEDURES AND COURT DATE & TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 2/24/2022 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge LESTER BASS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCase 452022DR000121DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: BASS , LESTER B assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less