Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/20/2019 at 16:31:41 (UTC).

COBB, ERIC WARREN VS COBB, SHEILA MUHWEZI

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 COBB, ERIC WARREN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COBB, SHEILA MUHWEZI. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COBB, ERIC WARREN

Respondent

COBB, SHEILA MUHWEZI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING: 10/22/2019 1PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • ORDER REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • EMAIL: COBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • MOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • MARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 151944

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case 452019DR000873DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less