This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:25:56 (UTC).

CLEVELAND, JAKE LEE VS BUSH, WHITNEY JORDAN

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 CLEVELAND, JAKE LEE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BUSH, WHITNEY JORDAN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC C and ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC C

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLEVELAND, JAKE LEE

Respondent

BUSH, WHITNEY JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CLARK, JOHN JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

ZIMA, REBECCA NIKIRK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT AND FOR ENFORCEMENT AND ENFORCEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMOTION: TO MODIFY STANDING FAMILY LAW OCOURT ORDER TO ALLOW MOTHER'S REQUESTED RELOCATION TO KINGSLAND, GEORGIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMOTHER'S VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION: TO MODIFY TEMPORARY TIMESHARING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: REBECCA ZIMA, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: 04/25/22 10:45 AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: 04/25/22 10:45 AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 04/25/22 10:45 AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION: TO KEEP CHILD IN STATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketUCCJ AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPETITION: TO ESTABLISH PARENTAL RESPOSIBILITY AND A PARENTING / TIME -SHARING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000725DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/4/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMA, REBECCA NIKIRK