This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 23:55:08 (UTC).

CLARK, LACHELL VS HOWELL, JESSICA L

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 CLARK, LACHELL filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against HOWELL, JESSICA L. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLARK, LACHELL

Respondent

HOWELL, JESSICA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TERRY, BETH M.F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/06/2020

DocketMISCELLANEOUS: ACKNOWLEDGMENT - MOTHERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketCONSENT: FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD) - MOTHERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketNOTICE OF FILING: CONSENT FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT - PEITTIONERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JESSICA LECHELL HOWELL 07/08/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketNOTICE OF FILING: NON-ENFORCEABLE RETURN OF SERVICE - PETITIONERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2020

DocketCONSENT: FOR CHANGE OF NAME ( MINOR CHILD) - DEDRICK ARNOLD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2020

DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE - FATHERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2020

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JESSICA HOWELL, MOTHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2020

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2020

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER - PETITIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketUCCJ AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketPETITION: FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number YX 166690

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020

DocketCase 452020DR000566DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less