This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/03/2020 at 16:09:56 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS PUGH, LARRY D

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PUGH, LARRY D. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

PUGH, LARRY D

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/04/2020:COVER SHEET

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/04/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

08/04/2020:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/04/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: LARRY PUGH 10/27/20 9AM

08/05/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: LARRY PUGH 10/27/20 9AM

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2020

HearingEvent Date: 10/27/2020 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020

DocketSTIPULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: LARRY PUGH 10/27/20 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 10/27/2020 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 168003

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020

DocketNOTICE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2020

DocketCase 452020SC000678SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/4/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less