This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/01/2021 at 08:08:58 (UTC).

CHRISTENSEN KAY, MICHELLE, CHRISTENSEN, LAVONNE MARIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2021 CHRISTENSEN KAY, MICHELLE, CHRISTENSEN, LAVONNE MARIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTENSEN KAY, MICHELLE

Decedent

CHRISTENSEN, LAVONNE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ADAMS, MARK DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM WORLD OMNI FINANCIAL CORP DBA SOUTHEAST TOYOTA FINANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2021

DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER NASSAU

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021

DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2021

DocketCLOSING ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021

DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketPayment received: $235.00 Receipt Number YX 183777

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2021

DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2021

DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2021

DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2021

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2021

DocketCase 452021CP000311CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/25/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less