This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/11/2020 at 15:36:57 (UTC).

CHIRO STANDARD PLLC A/A/O DAWN VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 CHIRO STANDARD PLLC A/A/O DAWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHIRO STANDARD PLLC A/A/O DAWN

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWENS, DONALD RAY

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/12/2020:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/12/2020:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/12/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

08/12/2020:NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/12/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/12/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: STATE FARM

08/14/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: STATE FARM

 

Docket Entries

11/24/2020

HearingEvent Date: 11/24/2020 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2020

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 11/24/2020 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: STATE FARM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2020

DocketPayment received: $65.00 Receipt Number YX 168379

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2020

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2020

DocketCase 452020SC000731SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less