This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/07/2022 at 16:44:17 (UTC).

CHAMBERS, CECELIA W VS CHAMBERS, JOHN E

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 CHAMBERS, CECELIA W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHAMBERS, JOHN E. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHAMBERS, CECELIA W

Respondent

CHAMBERS, JOHN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLSON, REBECCA JETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 12/21/2022 9:30AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 205834

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: CECELIA CHAMBERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS JOHN E CHAMBERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: JOHN E CHAMBERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: REBECCA J COLSON, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE ANSWER AND WAIVER OF APP RESPONDENT'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase 452022DR000988DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less