Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 13:31:47 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE VS SHOENBERGER, CLARK

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE filed an Other lawsuit against SHOENBERGER, CLARK. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE

Defendant

SHOENBERGER, CLARK

Amelia Island, FL 32034-5625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: CLARK SHOENBERGER

10/07/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: CLARK SHOENBERGER

SUMMONS ISSUED: CLARK SHOENBERGER

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: CLARK SHOENBERGER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/25/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/25/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COVER SHEET

09/25/2019:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/25/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: CLARK SHOENBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: CLARK SHOENBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 151837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 452019CC000381CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B