Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/20/2019 at 15:31:30 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE VS REED, JENNIFER L

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REED, JENNIFER L. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nassau County Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE

Defendant

REED, JENNIFER L

Hilliard, FL 32046-3001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JENNIFER REED 10/10/19

10/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JENNIFER REED 10/10/19

SUMMONS ISSUED: JENNIFER REED

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: JENNIFER REED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JENNIFER REED

09/26/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JENNIFER REED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/26/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COVER SHEET

09/26/2019:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/26/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JENNIFER REED 10/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Event PRE scheduled on 11/26/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: JENNIFER REED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JENNIFER REED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 151915

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case 452019SC000470SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Event Date: 11/26/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B