This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:52:02 (UTC).

CATERPILLAR FINANCIAL SERVICES VS CLAXTON TRACTOR LLC BY SERVING Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 CATERPILLAR FINANCIAL SERVICES filed an Other lawsuit against CLAXTON TRACTOR LLC BY SERVING. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and JENNY BARRETT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

JENNY BARRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATERPILLAR FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

CLAXTON TRACTOR LLC BY SERVING

CLAXTON, JOHN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER, STACEY SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

EXECUTION

05/26/2022:EXECUTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EXECUTION TO SPRECHMAN & FISHER P.A.

05/26/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EXECUTION TO SPRECHMAN & FISHER P.A.

NOTICE OF SERVICE:

05/17/2022:NOTICE OF SERVICE:

NOTICE: OF MAILING ORDER

05/16/2022:NOTICE: OF MAILING ORDER

CLOSING DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

04/27/2022:CLOSING DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT: OF PROOF

03/28/2022:AFFIDAVIT: OF PROOF

AFFIDAVIT: OF INTEREST

03/28/2022:AFFIDAVIT: OF INTEREST

AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES

03/28/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

03/28/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

01/26/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

NOTICE OF HEARING: 12/21/21 @ 11AM

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING: 12/21/21 @ 11AM

MOTION: TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING

11/24/2021:MOTION: TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING

DEFAULT: CLAXTON TRACTOR LLC AND JOHN L CLAXTON

10/13/2021:DEFAULT: CLAXTON TRACTOR LLC AND JOHN L CLAXTON

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

10/04/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/04/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

09/30/2021:MOTION: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CLAXTON TRACTOR 8/31/21

09/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CLAXTON TRACTOR 8/31/21

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOHN CLAXTON 8/31/2021

09/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOHN CLAXTON 8/31/2021

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEXECUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EXECUTION TO SPRECHMAN & FISHER P.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE: OF MAILING ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT: OF PROOF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT: OF INTEREST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
08/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: CLAXTON TRACTOR LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021

DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number YX 184885

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketCase 452021CC000264CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less