This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 06/04/2023 at 03:33:16 (UTC).

SREIT Enclave on Woodbridge LL VS Calderon, Maria C

Case Summary

On 03/31/2023 SREIT Enclave on Woodbridge LL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Calderon, Maria C. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SREIT Enclave on Woodbridge LL

Defendant

Calderon, Maria C

Not Classified By Court

CALDERON, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL GEORGE F

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

03/31/2023:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/31/2023:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/31/2023:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE: EVICTION PACKET TO DEFENDANTS

03/31/2023:CERTIFICATE: EVICTION PACKET TO DEFENDANTS

SUMMONS ISSUED: MARIA CALDERON

04/05/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED: MARIA CALDERON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKET

04/12/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKET

RESPONSE: MARIA CALDERON

04/14/2023:RESPONSE: MARIA CALDERON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

04/22/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

04/22/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARIA CALDERON 4/08/23 POSTED

04/22/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARIA CALDERON 4/08/23 POSTED

JUDICIAL DEFAULT: MARIA C CALDERON

05/12/2023:JUDICIAL DEFAULT: MARIA C CALDERON

CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FROM PL ATTY

05/12/2023:CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FROM PL ATTY

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

05/12/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

05/17/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARIA C. CALDERON 05/22/23

05/24/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARIA C. CALDERON 05/22/23

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARIA C. CALDERON 05/22/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FROM PL ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJUDICIAL DEFAULT: MARIA C CALDERON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARIA CALDERON 4/08/23 POSTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE: MARIA CALDERON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: MARIA CALDERON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number YX 212306

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE: EVICTION PACKET TO DEFENDANTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023

DocketCase 452023CC000138CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less