This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/12/2023 at 02:59:36 (UTC).

OSBORNE, MARTHA JANE, PETREY, WARD LEON Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2023 OSBORNE, MARTHA JANE, PETREY, WARD LEON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Decedent

OSBORNE, MARTHA JANE

Not Classified By Court

PETREY, WARD LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SMITH, TOD R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/08/2023

DocketCompliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 9/7/2024

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketPROBATE DOCUMENTS FROM KENTUCKY FOR ESTATE OF MARTHA OSBORNE *PR WARD LEON PETREY*

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 218970

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE OF MARTHA OSBORNE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketCase 452023CP000424CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less