This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/14/2023 at 02:11:11 (UTC).

BAGGETT, JOYCE, MORGAN, JAMES LOUIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 BAGGETT, JOYCE, MORGAN, JAMES LOUIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORGAN, JOYCE

Decedent

MORGAN, JAMES LOUIS

Not Classified By Court

BAGGETT, JOYCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHEMER, BLAIR DOUGLAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2023

DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCompliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 9/12/2024

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 219829

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketAFFIDAVIT: AS TO HEIRS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCase 452023CP000448CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less