This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/20/2019 at 12:54:47 (UTC).

BARJAN LLC VS MOONEYHAN, WALTER

Case Summary

On 06/01/2010 BARJAN LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MOONEYHAN, WALTER. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURGESS, GRANVILLE C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURGESS, GRANVILLE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARJAN LLC

Defendant

MOONEYHAN, WALTER

Not Classified By Court

DISCOUNT ELECTRONICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLANTON, CURTIS HUGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2012

DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2011

DocketNOT: OF CANCELLATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2011

DocketDISPOSITION NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2011

DocketNOT: OF CANCELLATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2011

DocketEXECUTED SUBPOENA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2011

DocketNOT: OF TAKING DEPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2010

DocketNOT: OF TAKING DEPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2010

DocketASM: CERTIFY/COPIES CICO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2010

DocketASM: COPIES CICO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2010

DocketSCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/30/2010

DocketAFF: AFFIDAVIT INTEREST/COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2010

DocketDEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2010

DocketAFF: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2010

DocketMOT: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2010

DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS/RTD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2010

DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2010

DocketASM: SUMMONS ISSUED SC CC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2010

DocketOPN: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2010

DocketSCANNED DOCUMENT OPEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2010

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less