This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 18:39:25 (UTC).

WORLD WIDE AUTO CREDIT LLC VS WILLIAMS, SAMANTHA LEA

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 WORLD WIDE AUTO CREDIT LLC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against WILLIAMS, SAMANTHA LEA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLD WIDE AUTO CREDIT LLC

Defendant

WILLIAMS, SAMANTHA LEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWEN, GEORGE ELLISON

 

Court Documents

REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

05/26/2020:REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

PROOF OF CLAIM

05/26/2020:PROOF OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

05/26/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/26/2020:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

05/26/2020:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

MISCELLANEOUS: AUTHORIZATION OF CORP OFFICER

05/26/2020:MISCELLANEOUS: AUTHORIZATION OF CORP OFFICER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER ABATING ACTION

05/27/2020:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER ABATING ACTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

07/15/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/16/2020:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

07/20/2020:AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED: SAMANTHA LEA WILLIAMS

07/20/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: SAMANTHA LEA WILLIAMS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 8/25/20 10:00AM

07/24/2020:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 8/25/20 10:00AM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/27/2020:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/28/2020:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SAMANTHA WILLIAMS 7/29/20

07/31/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SAMANTHA WILLIAMS 7/29/20

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2020

HearingEvent Date: 08/25/2020 10:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: OTSC; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: SAMANTHA WILLIAMS 7/29/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2020

DocketEvent OTSC scheduled on 8/25/2020 at 1000 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 8/25/20 10:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SAMANTHA LEA WILLIAMS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2020

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 167226

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMISCELLANEOUS: AUTHORIZATION OF CORP OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketREPLEVIN COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketPayment received: $385.00 Receipt Number YX 164994

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $385.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketCase 452020CC000135CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/26/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketJudge: POOLE , WESLEY R assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less