This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 06/04/2023 at 04:22:13 (UTC).

SREIT Enclave on Woodbridge LL VS Mcneil, Patricia E

Case Summary

On 05/01/2023 SREIT Enclave on Woodbridge LL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mcneil, Patricia E. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SREIT Enclave on Woodbridge LL

Defendant

Mcneil, Patricia E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL GEORGE F

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

05/01/2023:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/01/2023:COMPLAINT

EVICTION SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/01/2023:EVICTION SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED

05/01/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKET

05/03/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKET

SUMMONS ISSUED: PATRICIA MCNEIL

05/03/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED: PATRICIA MCNEIL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/08/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAUL JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY

05/17/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAUL JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

05/17/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PATRICIA MCNEIL, 5/08/23, POSTED

05/17/2023:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PATRICIA MCNEIL, 5/08/23, POSTED

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

05/25/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: PATRICIA MCNEIL, 5/08/23, POSTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAUL JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

DocketRESPONSE: FROM PATRICIA MCNEIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: PATRICIA MCNEIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number YX 213629

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketCase 452023CC000184CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less