This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/14/2023 at 04:21:45 (UTC).

BEAN, CASSANDRA VS BEAN, RHETT

Case Summary

On 07/18/2023 BEAN, CASSANDRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BEAN, RHETT. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL, JAMES HUNT and DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEAN, CASSANDRA

Respondent

BEAN, RHETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALVAREZ, ALEXA KELLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/11/2023

DocketPARENTING PLAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 09/06/2023 AT 9:25 AM VIS ZOOM - AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 08/31/2023 AT 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION: CASSANDRA BEAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION: RHETT BEAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketJudge: DANIEL , JAMES H Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 217291

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
07/18/2023

DocketANSWER AND WAIVER: TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketUCCJ AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: CASSANDRA BEAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: ALEXA K. ALVAREZ, ESQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCase 452023DR000604DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/18/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less