This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/09/2023 at 04:40:49 (UTC).

Nelson, Gene Milton VS Murphy, Amy Chanel

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 Nelson, Gene Milton filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Murphy, Amy Chanel. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL, JAMES HUNT and DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nelson, Gene Milton

Respondent

Murphy, Amy Chanel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALVAREZ, ALEXA KELLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/25/2023

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketCLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 04/25/2023 AT 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketJudge: DANIEL , JAMES H Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 212572

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketANSWER AND WAIVER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: ALEXA K. ALVEREZ, ESQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketCase 452023DR000320DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 4/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less