This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/08/2023 at 03:06:18 (UTC).

DAVIS, JOHN LEE, DAVIS-CARTER, ANDREA OLETHA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2023 DAVIS, JOHN LEE, DAVIS-CARTER, ANDREA OLETHA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOHNSON, NADINE DAVIS

DAVIS-CARTER, ANDREA OLETHA

Decedent

DAVIS, JOHN LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/16/2023

DocketPayment received: $13.00 Receipt Number YX 215752

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketPayment received: $4.00 Receipt Number YX 215751

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $4.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketPayment received: $8.00 Receipt Number YX 215719

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $8.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $2.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCLOSING ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketPayment received: $231.00 Receipt Number YX 214702

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE OF HELEN DEJOURNETT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE OF ROSALIE DAVIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE OF JOHN DAVIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION **JOHN DAVIS CASE #00-CP-39**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2023

DocketCase 452023CP000268CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less