This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/07/2023 at 04:20:38 (UTC).

WAGNER, SARAH ASHLYN VS GIBBS, ZACHARY D.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 WAGNER, SARAH ASHLYN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GIBBS, ZACHARY D. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WAGNER, SARAH ASHLYN

Respondent

GIBBS, ZACHARY D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBBIE, KATHRYN LYNN SEAGLE

Respondent Attorney

CASTRO, DEANNE H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023

DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION 09/21/2023 AT 1:00 PM VIA ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketREQUEST: FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketANSWER TO SUPPLEMENTAL COUNTER-PETITION TO MODIFY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketORDER REFERING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketCOUNTER PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketPayment received: $295.00 Receipt Number YX 214561

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $295.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: DEANNE CASTRO, ESQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketANSWER TO PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
02/14/2023

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 209616

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketPETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT/ ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 209284

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketCase 452023DR000113DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less