This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/07/2023 at 02:42:59 (UTC).

BREWER, CYNTHIA T., HEALY, NORMA JACKSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 BREWER, CYNTHIA T , HEALY, NORMA JACKSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BREWER, CYNTHIA T.

Decedent

HEALY, NORMA JACKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DRAKE, KRISTEN DABBS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/28/2023

DocketPROBATE AUDIT CHECKLIST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketWAIVER CYNTHIA BREWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketINVENTORY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO ESTATE TAX DUE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
04/11/2023

DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 211571

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketCase 452023CP000139CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less