This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/19/2022 at 04:41:03 (UTC).

CARTESIAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNE VS KENNEY, ANDREW R Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 CARTESIAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KENNEY, ANDREW R. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

BARRETT, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTESIAN POINTE PROPERTY OWNE

Defendants

KENNEY, ANDREW R

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANDREW R. KE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTTMANN, DAVID DANIEL

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT: ANDREW KENNEY

01/19/2022:DEFAULT: ANDREW KENNEY

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 2

01/14/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 1

01/14/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 1

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPS OF ANDREW KENNEY

01/14/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPS OF ANDREW KENNEY

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANDREW KENNEY 12/21/21

01/14/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANDREW KENNEY 12/21/21

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: UNK TENANT 1, UNK TENANT 2, UNK SPS OF ANDREW KENNEY, ALL OTHER UNK PARTIES

01/14/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: UNK TENANT 1, UNK TENANT 2, UNK SPS OF ANDREW KENNEY, ALL OTHER UNK PARTIES

ORDER GRANTING: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

01/13/2022:ORDER GRANTING: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

12/09/2021:MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/11/2021:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/09/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANDREW KENNEY

09/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANDREW KENNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED: ANDREW KENNEY

09/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: ANDREW KENNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

09/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

09/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

COMPLAINT

08/30/2021:COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/30/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/30/2021:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT: ANDREW KENNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPS OF ANDREW KENNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANDREW KENNEY 12/21/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: UNK TENANT 1, UNK TENANT 2, UNK SPS OF ANDREW KENNEY, ALL OTHER UNK PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
09/01/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $340.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

DocketCase 452021CC000283CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/30/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less