This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/20/2019 at 21:02:25 (UTC).

CARAWAY, VIRGINIA L VS WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Case Summary

On 01/07/2013 CARAWAY, VIRGINIA L filed an Other lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK NA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R, POOLE, WESLEY R. and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

POOLE, WESLEY R.

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARAWAY, VIRGINIA L

Defendant

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOOLEY, DANIEL J

Defendant Attorney

MCLEOD, AMELIA WILLIAMS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2013

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2013

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2013

DocketAMENDED: NTC UNAV

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2013

DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2013

DocketORDER DENYING: MTN TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013

DocketEvent MOT scheduled on 6/5/2013 at 1100 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013

DocketJudge: POOLE , WESLEY R. Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2013

DocketMOTION: FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2013

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING:060513 1100AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2013

DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
01/07/2013

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: WELLS FARGO NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 9645

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2013

DocketCase 452013CC000005CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 1/7/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2013

DocketEvent Date: 06/05/2013 11:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: MOT; Location: YX ROBERT E WILLIAMS; Defendant Attorney: WILLIAMS, AMELIA A ESQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less