Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 15:31:03 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS WAY, ROSE M

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WAY, ROSE M. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nassau County Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

WAY, ROSE M

Callahan, FL 32011-8585

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/03/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

10/03/2019:ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED: ROSE WAY

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: ROSE WAY

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/25/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

09/25/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/25/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/25/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/25/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/25/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: ROSE WAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Event PRE scheduled on 11/26/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 151824

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 452019SC000461SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Event Date: 11/26/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUIR , DANIELA