This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 06/09/2022 at 15:37:28 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS GILLILAND, JENNIFER H

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GILLILAND, JENNIFER H. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM, HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

GILLILAND, JENNIFER H

Hilliard, FL 32046-7460

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

05/10/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/10/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/10/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/10/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/10/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: JENNIFER GILLILAND

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: JENNIFER GILLILAND

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/21/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 6/21/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JENNIFER GILLILAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 196516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase 452022SC000256SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 5/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel