This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/20/2019 at 15:31:34 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS BICKFORD, DEEANNA J

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BICKFORD, DEEANNA J. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

BICKFORD, DEEANNA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/26/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/26/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

06/26/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/26/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/26/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: DEEANNA BICKFORD

07/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: DEEANNA BICKFORD

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/03/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

07/03/2019:ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/19/2019:CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2019

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: DEEANNA BICKFORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2019

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 10/1/2019 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 146515

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000307SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/26/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019

DocketEvent Date: 10/01/2019 09:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: PRE; Location: YX HISTORIC COURTROOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less